Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Györgi Cardinal Martinuzzi, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1482²Born
1510²28.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
1536²54.0AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
30 May 153957.4AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
1548²66.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
12 Oct 155169.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 155169.9DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Györgi Martinuzzi (VIAF: 39435999)
Györgi Cardinal Martinuzzi O.S.P.P.E. (born 1482, died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamicac
Death PlaceAlvinczy Castle
Buried Place (Original)St. Michael's, Church, Karlsburg

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
  • a cardinal for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Oct 1551
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Aug 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 161, and Page 326
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018