Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Luzinszky

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornKrakow
9 May 167870.3AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
18 Sep 167870.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
6 Feb 168173.0DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joachim Luzinszky:
Bishop Joachim Luzinszky (born 1608, died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a bishop for 2.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 358, and Page 404
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015