Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Dominis

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1432AppointedBishop of Senj, Croatia
2 Dec 1440AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
10 Nov 1444DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Dominis:
Bishop Giovanni de Dominis (died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 237, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015