Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver Kalatay

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1722BornOfalu
1756²33.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 178764.8SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
10 Mar 178865.4ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
27 Apr 178865.5Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
27 Mar 179572.4DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Kalatay
Bishop Franz Xaver Kalatay (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 432

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016