Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zsigmond Thurzó

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465Born
4 Aug 150338.5AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
15 Nov 150439.8AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
19 Dec 150540.9AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
12 Sep 151247.6DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Zsigmond Thurzó:
Bishop Zsigmond Thurzó (died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 326, and Page 259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015