Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria Parruco Tries, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1736Born
14 Apr 175922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Oct 179761.4SelectedBishop of Bovino, Italy
29 Jan 179861.6ConfirmedBishop of Bovino, Italy
2 Feb 179861.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
8 Aug 179862.2DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Parruco Tries
Bishop Vincenzo Maria Parruco Tries O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast