Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Martini

Deceased

Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1735BornSan Bartolomeo in Galdo
31 Oct 179762.6SelectedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
29 Jan 179862.8ConfirmedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
2 Feb 179862.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
1808¹72.7DiedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Martini
Bishop Nicola Martini (born , died 1808) Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 446
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016