Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino (Michelangelo) Vitale, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Minori, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1738Born
8 Mar 176123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
31 Oct 179759.6SelectedBishop of Minori, Italy
29 Jan 179859.9ConfirmedBishop of Minori, Italy
2 Feb 179859.9Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
7 Feb 180162.9DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino (Michelangelo) Vitale
Bishop Serafino (Michelangelo) Vitale O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Minori

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCava

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 290
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 15
  • mn/d: CB, 17 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast