Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Pietro (Andelo Petar) Galli

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1763³Born
16 Feb 178824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Corf¨, Greece
23 Feb 180137.3AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
1 Mar 180137.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
26 Jan 181248.3DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Pietro (Andelo Petar) Galli
Bishop Angelo Pietro (Andelo Petar) Galli (born Oct 1763, died ) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorfu, Italy

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,801, Number 10
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast