Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Luigi Piervisani

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1766BornAssisi
29 May 179024.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 180034.6AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
27 Dec 180034.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
15 Jan 184881.6DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Luigi Piervisani:
Bishop Francesco Luigi Piervisani (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013