Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Leopardi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Akka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1743BornRecanati
14 Apr 177026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
31 Mar 180662.9AppointedBishop of Akka
1 May 180662.9Ordained BishopBishop of Akka
17 Jul 180764.1DiedBishop of Akka

MicroData Summary for Pietro Leopardi:
Bishop Pietro Leopardi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Akka

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 56
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013