Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Pinelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1735Born
1 Jun 179560.1AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
21 Jun 179560.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
6 Jan 182185.7ResignedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Pinelli
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Pinelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Trogir (Tra¨)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrogir

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 411
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,709
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1795, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018