Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Pio Vitale

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1751BornMondovi
20 Aug 177524.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 179139.9SelectedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
11 Apr 179140.1ConfirmedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
26 Apr 179140.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
29 May 180352.3ResignedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
3 Jul 180453.3SelectedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
1 Feb 180553.9ConfirmedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
11 May 182170.2DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pio Vitale:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Pio Vitale (born , died ) Bishop of Mondovi

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 73
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,501
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015