Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Canaveri, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1753BornMari
21 Sep 177622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 Jun 179743.7SelectedBishop of Biella, Italy
24 Jul 179743.8ConfirmedBishop of Biella, Italy
6 Aug 179743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
1803¹49.2ResignedBishop of Biella, Italy
3 Jul 180450.7SelectedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
1 Feb 180551.3ConfirmedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
11 Jan 181157.2DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Canaveri
Bishop Giovanni Battista Canaveri C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 393
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016