Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iosephus Maria Tobia, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jun 1796AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tinos, Greece
10 Jun 1796AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
26 Jun 1796Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
Sep 1799³SucceededBishop of Tinos, Greece
21 Feb 1809AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
19 Jul 1815DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iosephus Maria Tobia:
Bishop Iosephus Maria Tobia O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 408
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013