Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Benigni

Deceased

Bishop of Terni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1745BornFabriano
22 Nov 177227.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179651.1AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
3 Jul 179651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
12 Apr 182276.9DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Benigni:
Bishop Carlo Benigni (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1819
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 244
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013