Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Pietro Grimaldi

Deceased

Archbishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1754BornMoncalieri
24 Jan 177925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
14 Jun 179743.4SelectedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
24 Jul 179743.5ConfirmedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
6 Aug 179743.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
1803¹48.9ResignedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
1 Feb 180551.0AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
8 Aug 181763.5SelectedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
1 Oct 181763.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
1 Jan 183075.9DiedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Pietro Grimaldi
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Pietro Grimaldi (born , died ) Archbishop of Vercelli

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 338
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 225, and Page 393
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016