Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Bonifacio Fassati, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1728Born
18 Sep 175122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Apr 179667.4SelectedBishop of Tortona, Italy
27 Jun 179667.6ConfirmedBishop of Tortona, Italy
31 Jul 179667.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
1803¹74.1ResignedBishop of Tortona, Italy
23 Dec 181789.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tortona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pio Bonifacio Fassati
Bishop Pio Bonifacio Fassati O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 194
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 19
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018