Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Calderón Batres

Bishop Emeritus of Linares, Nuevo León, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1938 Born
1 Jul 196223.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 198849.2AppointedBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
25 Mar 198849.4Ordained BishopBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México
19 Nov 201476.0RetiredBishop of Linares, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Ramón Calderón Batres
Bishop Ramón Calderón Batres (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Linares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Luz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Linares.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,120
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018