Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Zornoza Boy

Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1949 BornMadrid
19 Mar 197525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
23 Jul 199142.0IncardinatedPriest of Getafe, Spain
13 Dec 200556.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Getafe, Spain
13 Dec 200556.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mentesa
5 Feb 200656.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mentesa
30 Aug 201162.1AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Zornoza Boy:
Bishop Rafael Zornoza Boy (born ) Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,054
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013