Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquin Maria López de Andújar y Cánovas del Castillo

Bishop Emeritus of Getafe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1942 Born
30 Nov 196826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
19 Mar 200158.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Getafe, Spain
19 Mar 200158.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcavica
6 May 200158.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcavica
29 Oct 200462.1AppointedBishop of Getafe, Spain
19 Dec 200462.2InstalledBishop of Getafe, Spain
3 Jan 201875.3RetiredBishop of Getafe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquin Maria López de Andújar y Cánovas del Castillo
Bishop Joaquin Maria López de Andújar y Cánovas del Castillo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Getafe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopSagrado Corazón de Jesús, Basilica, Cerro de los Ángeles, Diocese of Getafe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Getafe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,972
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2018