Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieudonné Madrapile Tanzi

Bishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1958 Born
25 Aug 198527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
2 Apr 201657.6AppointedBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Jul 201657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Dieudonné Madrapile Tanzi
Bishop Dieudonné Madrapile Tanzi (born ) Bishop of Isangi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaradje
Ordained BishopCathedral, Isangi, Diocese of Isangi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Isangi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 4 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 10 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,059

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast