Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaos Charichiopoulos (Harikoupoulos)

Deceased

Bishop of Chios (Scio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1869BornTinos
30 May 189626.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 191747.1AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
25 Mar 191747.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
1 Jul 193969.6DiedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece

MicroData Summary for Nikolaos Charichiopoulos (Harikoupoulos):
Bishop Nikolaos Charichiopoulos (Harikoupoulos) (born , died ) Bishop of Chios (Scio)

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013