Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Salmorin Bantolo

Bishop of Masbate, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1960 Born
3 Aug 198524.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
21 Apr 198625.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
15 Jun 201150.5AppointedBishop of Masbate, Philippines
22 Aug 201150.7Ordained BishopBishop of Masbate, Philippines
6 Sep 201150.8InstalledBishop of Masbate, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Salmorin Bantolo
Bishop José Salmorin Bantolo (born ) Bishop of Masbate

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuisijan, Laua-an, Antique

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Masbate.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • od/op/ob/i: CB, 22 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 5 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018