Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Albeiro Maldonado Monsalve

Bishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1958 BornFredonia
5 Jul 198628.4Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
15 Oct 201557.7AppointedBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
3 Dec 201557.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
15 Dec 201557.9InstalledBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Albeiro Maldonado Monsalve:
Bishop Luis Albeiro Maldonado Monsalve (born ) Bishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mocoa-Sibundoy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 15 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 30 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Nov 2015