Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Víctor Manuel Ochoa Cadavid

Bishop of Málaga-Soatá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1962 BornBello
5 Jul 198623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
24 Jan 200643.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
24 Jan 200643.2AppointedTitular Bishop of San Leone
1 Apr 200643.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of San Leone
24 Jan 201148.2AppointedBishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia
5 Mar 201148.3InstalledBishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Víctor Manuel Ochoa Cadavid:
Bishop Víctor Manuel Ochoa Cadavid (born ) Bishop of Málaga-Soatá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Málaga-Soatá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,107
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015