Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carl Leonard Reid

Ordinary of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1950 Born
15 Apr 201261.3Converted
12 Jan 201362.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA
26 Jan 201362.1Ordained PriestPriest of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA
26 Mar 201968.2AppointedOrdinary of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia
27 Aug 201968.7InstalledOrdinary of Our Lady of the Southern Cross, Australia

MicroData Summary for Carl Leonard Reid
Father Carl Leonard Reid (born ) Ordinary of Our Lady of the Southern Cross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHagersville, Ontario, Canada
Ordained PriestNotre Dame, Cathedral, Ottawa, Archdiocese of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

Please contact the Father through the Personal Ordinariate of Our Lady of the Southern Cross.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2019
  • od/c0/mn: CB, 27 Mar 2019
  • bp: CL, 12 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast