Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mario León Dorado, O.M.I.

Prefect of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1974 Born
24 Sep 199622.5ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 Jun 200127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Jun 201339.2AppointedPrefect of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

MicroData Summary for Mario León Dorado
Father Mario León Dorado O.M.I. (born ) Prefect of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2013
  • b: CB, 24 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast