Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prefecture Apostolic of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

Apostolica Praefectura de Sahara Occidentali



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mario León Dorado, O.M.I., Prefect

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Prefecture Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 2 May 1976
  • Prefecture
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Western Sahara
  • Square Kilometers: 250,000 (96,562 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Mision Catolica, B.P. 31, 70001 L'Aayoune, Sahara Occidental
  • Telephone: (0528)89.32.70

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara and Ifni {Sahara Español e Ifni}
5 July 1954ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara and Ifni {Sahara Español e Ifni} (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara {Sahara Español}
2 May 1970Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara and Ifni {Sahara Español e Ifni} Prefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara {Sahara Español}
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}
2 May 1976Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara {Sahara Español} Prefecture Apostolic of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Spanish Sahara {Sahara Español}
196922,51270,00032.2%11112,04613315ap1971
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}
1978365151,000.2%3312132ap1981
199075200,000.0%551552ap1991
1999160350,260.0%335332ap2000
2000150350,250.0%227522ap2001
2001150350,000.0%335032ap2002
2002100400,000.0%333332ap2003
2003120400,000.0%334032ap2004
2004110400,000.0%333632ap2005
2010120800,265.0%334032ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 28 Jun 2013