Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Félix Erviti Barcelona, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1910BornValcarlos, Spain
19 Feb 193322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Jul 195444.0AppointedPrefect of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}
6 Jul 199483.9RetiredPrefect of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}
24 Nov 200090.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

MicroData Summary for Félix Erviti Barcelona:
Priest Félix Erviti Barcelona O.M.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

  • a priest for 67.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013