Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Acacio Valbuena Rodríguez, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1922BornHorcadas, Spain
17 Mar 194522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
10 Jul 199472.2AppointedPrefect of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}
25 Feb 200986.8RetiredPrefect of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}
4 May 201189.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

MicroData Summary for Acacio Valbuena Rodríguez:
Priest Acacio Valbuena Rodríguez O.M.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Western Sahara {Sahara Occiental}

  • a priest for 66.1 years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013