Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tanger

Archidioecesis Tingitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 November 1956
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Morocco
  • Square Kilometers: 28,000 (10,815 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Sidi Bouabid 55, B.P. 2116 [Socco], 90000 Tanger, Marruecos
  • Telephone: (0539)932-762
  • Fax: 949-117

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos
28 November 1630ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos
14 April 1908ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos Vicariate Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos
2 July 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos Vicariate Apostolic of Rabat (erected)
Archdiocese of Tanger
14 November 1956ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos Archdiocese of Tanger

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos
1950113,164760,50014.9%2250721,57111422115ap1951
Archdiocese of Tanger
197025,0361,550,1311.6%245475327718119ap1971
19809,7502,072,000.5%25253903115515ap1981
19904,4002,506,250.2%15152931911410ap1991
19993,0004,000,000.1%28103001311410ap2000
20002,0004,002,100.0%279222121117ap2001
20012,0644,100,000.1%21012172151158ap2002
20021,6814,100,000.0%2810168121078ap2003
20032,1504,200,000.1%21012179141019ap2004
20042,5104,200,000.1%27927811959ap2005
20102,0194,000,000.1%371020112878ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013