Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Betanzos y Hormaechevarría, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1863BornGuernica y Luno, Spain
16 Oct 188724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Jul 192662.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos, Morocco
17 Jul 192662.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
26 Dec 192663.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
27 Dec 194885.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos, Morocco

MicroData Summary for José María Betanzos y Hormaechevarría:
Bishop José María Betanzos y Hormaechevarría O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Marocco o Marruecos

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013