Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francisco Muñoz e Izquierdo

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Vicar Apostolic of Spain, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1868BornBurjasot
1892²23.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 191648.0AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
15 Oct 191648.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
14 Dec 192557.6AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
16 Dec 192557.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Spain, Military
12 Apr 193062.0DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Muñoz e Izquierdo:
Patriarch Francisco Muñoz e Izquierdo (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013