Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl-Heinz Wiesemann

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1960 BornHerford
10 Oct 198525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
4 Jul 200241.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
4 Jul 200241.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
8 Sep 200242.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
19 Dec 200747.4AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
2 Mar 200847.6InstalledBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl-Heinz Wiesemann:
Bishop Karl-Heinz Wiesemann (born ) Bishop of Speyer

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Speyer.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014