Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Abelardo Mata Guevara, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Esteli, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1946 Born
8 Dec 196620.4ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Aug 197630.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Feb 198841.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
13 Feb 198841.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Coeliana
19 Mar 198841.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coeliana
6 Mar 199043.7AppointedBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua
5 Apr 199043.7InstalledBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua
6 Jul 202175.0RetiredBishop of Esteli, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Juan Abelardo Mata Guevara
Bishop Juan Abelardo Mata Guevara S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Esteli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManagua, Archdiocese of Managua
Ordained BishopManagua, Archdiocese of Managua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Esteli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,339
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Jul 2021

Quantcast