Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Florido Ambrogio Acciari, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1880Born
10 Aug 190423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Mar 193857.3AppointedArchbishop of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece
5 Jun 193857.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece
10 Mar 197089.3DiedArchbishop of Rhodos {Rhodes}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Florido Ambrogio Acciari
Archbishop Florido Ambrogio Acciari O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rhodos {Rhodes}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccalvecce

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast