Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Nepal

Vicariatus Apostolicus Nepalianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Simick, Vicar Apostolic
  • Anthony Francis Sharma, S.J., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 10 February 2007
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nepal
  • Square Kilometers: 147,181 (56,848 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic.org.np/
  • Mailing Address: Assumption Church, G.P.O. Box 8975 EPC 343, Kathmandu, Nepal
  • Telephone: (1)5542.802
  • Fax: 5521.710

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Nepal
7 October 1983ErectedDiocese of Patna Mission "Sui Iuris" of Nepal (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Nepal
8 November 1996ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Nepal Prefecture Apostolic of Nepal
Vicariate Apostolic of Nepal
10 February 2007ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Nepal Vicariate Apostolic of Nepal

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Nepal
19882,17417,500,000.0%2283072415613ap1991
Prefecture Apostolic of Nepal
19995,96223,000,000.0%63743138599133ap2000
20006,05723,000,000.0%73946131659844ap2001
20016,19523,000,000.0%1140511216710435ap2002
20036,68123,700,000.0%938471425411238ap2004
20047,15124,421,000.0%940491455611542ap2005
Vicariate Apostolic of Nepal
20107,73127,504,000.0%145367115791608ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Jul 2014