Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Leonid Varouhas

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1889Born
29 Jun 191122.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 193243.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
11 Jun 193243.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
10 Jul 193243.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
28 Jan 195767.9DiedApostolic Exarch of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Denis Leonid Varouhas
Bishop Denis Leonid Varouhas (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of Istanbul (Constantinople)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthenai

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018