Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges El-Murr, B.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1930Born
27 Jul 195827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
26 Aug 199261.8AppointedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
23 Oct 199262.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
199766.2AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Iraq (Melkite Greek)
2004¹73.2ResignedPatriarchal Exarch of Iraq (Melkite Greek)
18 Jun 200776.6RetiredArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
8 Feb 201786.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges El-Murr
Archbishop Georges El-Murr B.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Petra e Filadelfia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKa'a, Lebanon

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,931
  • d: CB, 9 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017