Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elias Chacour

Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1939 BornBiram
24 Jul 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 200666.2SelectedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
17 Feb 200666.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
25 Feb 200666.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
27 Jan 201474.2ResignedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel

MicroData Summary for Elias Chacour:
Archbishop Elias Chacour (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide]

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,076
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Jan 2014