Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Nicolas Haddad, S.M.S.P.

Archbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1957 Born
1976³18.5ProfessedMember of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
28 Aug 198326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
20 Apr 200244.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
20 Apr 200244.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Argentina (Melkite Greek)
23 Jun 200244.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
22 Sep 200245.2InstalledApostolic Exarch of Argentina (Melkite Greek)
18 Mar 200345.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
19 Dec 200548.4ResignedApostolic Exarch of Argentina (Melkite Greek)
7 Feb 200648.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
14 Oct 200649.3AppointedArchbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges Nicolas Haddad
Archbishop Georges Nicolas Haddad S.M.S.P. (born ) Archbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeirut

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,206
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • i: CB, 8 Oct 2015
  • ab: CB, 22 Jun 2017
  • prof/c1: CB, 18 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017