Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bl. Klymentiy Sheptytskyi, M.S.U. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1869Born
8 Dec 191344.0ProfessedMember of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
28 Aug 191545.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
22 Dec 191748.0Solemn VowsPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
17 Sep 193969.8SelectedApostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)
22 Nov 194172.0ConfirmedApostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)
1 May 195181.4DiedApostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Klymentiy Sheptytskyi
Father Bl. Klymentiy Sheptytskyi M.S.U. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of Russia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrylbychi, Ukraine

  • a priest for 35.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 17 Mar 2015
  • prof/sole: CB, 27 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 28 Dec 2018

Quantcast