Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michael Bernard McPartland, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)

Priest of Society of African Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1939Born
14 May 197838.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
9 Aug 200262.8AppointedPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
9 Aug 200262.8AppointedSuperior of Saint Helena, Ascension and Tristan da Cunha
29 Sep 201677.0RetiredPrefect of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)
29 Sep 201677.0RetiredSuperior of Saint Helena, Ascension and Tristan da Cunha
6 Apr 201777.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas, Falkland Islands (Malvinas)

MicroData Summary for Michael Bernard McPartland
Father Michael Bernard McPartland S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Falkland Islands o Malvinas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiddlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph's, Church, Middlesbrough, Cleveland, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceWatford General, Hospital, Watford, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Thorntree, Cemetery, Middlesbrough, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 38.8 years

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 2 May 2017
  • r: CB, 21 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 13 Feb 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast