Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Oberti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Feb 1567AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
24 Feb 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
13 Sep 1567DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Oberti
Bishop Paolo Oberti O.P. (died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018