Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerome de Leonibus

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1567AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
9 Feb 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
30 Oct 1577AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
3 Mar 1578DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Jerome de Leonibus
Archbishop Jerome de Leonibus (died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311, and Page 288
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018