Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cipriano Pallavicino

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1509¹Born
15 May 156657.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Dec 1566³57.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
14 Nov 156758.8AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
12 Mar 156859.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova, Italy
13 Nov 158576.8DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cipriano Pallavicino (VIAF: 70767948)
Archbishop Cipriano Pallavicino (born 1509, died ) Archbishop of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopPapal Sacristy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 215
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 13, Number 39
  • c3: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 16,998
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast