Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Piccolomini

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy

Bishop of Pienza


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Apr 1554AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
25 Nov 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
Dec 1563AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
1599²DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Piccolomini (VIAF: 30703008)
Bishop Francesco Maria Piccolomini (died 1599) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS.Laurent de piscibus, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast