Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Marchesini

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1567AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy
18 Apr 1567AppointedTitular Bishop of Maioren
19 May 1567Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maioren
23 Sep 1575AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
1580²DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Marchesini (VIAF: 304918033)
Bishop Ascanio Marchesini (died 1580) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233, and Page 148
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 11, Number 27
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018