Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiberio Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1566AppointedBishop of Potenza, Italy
26 May 1566Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
6 Feb 1579AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
1588²DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Carafa:
Bishop Tiberio Carafa Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 9, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 156, and Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013